OK HB3243 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; extending termination date of the Oklahoma Advisory Council on Indian Education; emergency.
Title
Schools; extending termination date of the Oklahoma Advisory Council on Indian Education; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Seneca Scott [D] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] |
Rep. Dustin Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - House - House: Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer committee meeting: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2014 |
2014-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 4 |
2014-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2014-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2014-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Brecheen (principal Senate author) |
2014-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Billy, Roberts (Dustin), Hoskin |
2014-03-11 | House | General Order |
2014-02-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Administrative Rules, Government Oversight and Repealer |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Scott |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |