OK HB2929 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-23 - Approved by Governor 06/03/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Insurance; distribution of claims; requiring funds distributed to the receiver to be utilized for certain purposes; effective date.
Title
Insurance; distribution of claims; requiring funds distributed to the receiver to be utilized for certain purposes; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. John Sparks [D] | Rep. Dan Kirby [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-21 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - House: Insurance Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 06/03/2014 |
2014-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2014-05-21 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2014-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2014-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2014-05-20 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2 |
2014-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2014-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2014-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2014-05-15 | Senate | SCs named Sparks, Brown, Loveless, Stanislawski, Marlatt, Burrage |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Insurance |
2014-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2014-03-03 | House | General Order |
2014-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2014-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2014-02-04 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2014-02-03 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2014-02-03 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 1435 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 1927 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 2691 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 311 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 348 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 4030 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |