OK HB1640 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progress
Action: 2013-04-23 - Approved by Governor 04/23/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Agriculture; modifying notice and hearing requirements; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture; modifying notice and hearing requirements; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-16 - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-23HouseApproved by Governor 04/23/2013
2013-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2013-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2013-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2013-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2013-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2013-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2013-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2013-03-25SenateReported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed
2013-03-13SenateSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development
2013-03-04SenateFirst Reading
2013-03-04HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2013-02-28HouseReferred for engrossment
2013-02-28HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 1
2013-02-28HouseGeneral Order
2013-02-18HouseAuthored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author)
2013-02-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife Committee
2013-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife
2013-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Jordan
2013-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2203New CodeSee Bill Text
2208New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback