OH SCR7 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 75-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-17 - Concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
As Adopted by the House 130th General AssemblyRegular Session2013-2014S. C. R. No. 7 Senator Hite
Title
As Adopted by the House 130th General AssemblyRegular Session2013-2014S. C. R. No. 7 Senator Hite
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - House - House - Resolution was adopted (Vote) (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Resolution Adoption (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-17 | Concurrence | |
2013-04-10 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-04-10 | Committee Report | |
2013-03-05 | To Public Utilities | |
2013-03-05 | Introduced to House | |
2013-04-17 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-04-17 | Committee Report | |
2013-04-16 | To Policy and Legislative Oversight | |
2013-04-16 | Introduced to Senate |