OH SB273 | 2007-2008 | 127th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-11 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2008 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-03-11 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Summary
To amend section 3318.032 and to enact section 3318.033 of the Revised Code to calculate an alternate equity list for fiscal year 2008 for purposes of determining school districts' eligibility for assistance under the Classroom Facilities Assistance Program and their local shares in fiscal year 2009, to calculate an alternative equity list for fiscal year 2009 funding under the Classroom Facilities Assistance Program and the Exceptional Needs School Facilities Assistance Program for certain school districts with large one-year reductions in valuation, to recalculate the local share of a current classroom facilities project for certain school districts that had a net gain in interdistrict open enrollment students when they became eligible for state facilities assistance, to specify the local share of new projects for certain school districts that previously received assistance, and to increase the percentage of classroom facilities appropriations that may be used for joint vocational school districts in fiscal year 2008.
Title
Classroom Facilities Assistance-alternate equity list
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2008-03-06 | Committee Report | |
2008-01-15 | To Finance & Financial Institutions | |
2008-01-15 | Introduced to House | |
2008-03-12 | To Finance & Appropriations | |
2008-03-12 | Introduced to Senate |
Ohio State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://archives.legislature.state.oh.us/bills.cfm?ID=127_SB_273 |