OH SB241 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-19 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-11-19 - Passed 3rd Consideration House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend Section 263.325 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly to modify the membership structure of the Straight A Program Governing Board.
Title
To amend Section 263.325 of Am. Sub. H.B. 59 of the 130th General Assembly to modify the membership structure of the Straight A Program Governing Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-19 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-11-13 | Committee Report | |
2013-11-19 | To Education | |
2013-11-19 | Introduced to House | |
2014-11-20 | To Education | |
2014-11-20 | Introduced to Senate |