OH HB95 | 2011-2012 | 129th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 21-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-09 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 4903.083, 4905.302, 4909.05, 4909.06, 4909.07, 4909.08, 4909.15, 4909.156, 4909.17, 4909.18, 4909.19, 4928.18, 4929.05, 4929.051, 4929.11, and 4935.04 and to enact sections 4909.191 and 4929.111 of the Revised Code to permit certain rate-calculation adjustments for natural gas companies, alter public notice requirements for rate cases, and, for natural gas companies, to make other regulatory changes concerning audits, alternative rate plans, and forecast reports, and allowing applications for natural gas company capital expenditure programs.
Title
To permit certain rate-calculation adjustments for natural gas companies, alter public notice requirements for rate cases, and, for natural gas companies, to make other regulatory changes concerning audits, alternative rate plans, and forecast reports, and allowing applications for natural gas company capital expenditure programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-25 - House - House - Senate Amendments (Y: 68 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Third Consideration (Y: 66 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 57 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House - Motion to Table Amendment (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-09 | Effective Date | |
2011-06-02 | Governor' Action | |
2011-06-11 | End of 10-day period | |
2011-05-31 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Concurrence | |
2011-05-25 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Committee Report - A | |
2011-05-05 | To Energy & Public Utilities | |
2011-05-05 | Introduced to Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2011-05-04 | Committee Report - S | |
2011-02-10 | To Public Utilities | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
49 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 03 | 083 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 05 | 302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 06 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 09 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 06 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 08 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 156 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 17 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 09 | 191 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 28 | 18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 29 | 05 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 29 | 051 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 29 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
49 | 29 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 35 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
49 | 35 | 04 | Amended Code | Citation Text |