OH HB49 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-10)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-13 - To Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-13 - To Civil Justice
Pending: Senate Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 173.501, 173.521, 173.542, 2317.54, 4715.36, 5101.60, 5101.61, 5101.611, 5101.62 to 5101.64, 5101.66 to 5101.71, 5101.99, 5123.61, and 5126.31; to amend, for the purpose of adopting new section numbers as indicated in parentheses, sections 5101.61 (5101.63), 5101.611 (5101.64), 5101.62 (5101.65), 5101.63 (5101.651), 5101.64 (5101.66), 5101.65 (5101.68), 5101.66 (5101.681), 5101.67 (5101.682), 5101.68 (5101.69), 5101.69 (5101.70), 5101.70 (5101.71), 5101.71 (5101.61), and 5101.72 (5101.611); and to enact new section 5101.62 and sections 5101.631, 5101.632, 5101.701, 5101.702, 5101.74, and 5101.741 of the Revised Code to revise the laws governing the provision of adult protective services.
Title
To revise the laws governing the provision of adult protective services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - House - House - Motion agreed to and so amended (Vote) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-13 | To Civil Justice | |
2014-02-13 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-02-12 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-12-11 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-02-12 | To Judiciary | |
2013-02-12 | Introduced to House |