OH HB296 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-40)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 63-40)
Status: Passed on April 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-21 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.713, 3313.718, 4729.51, and 4729.60 and to enact sections 3313.7110, 3313.7111, 3314.143, 3326.28, 3328.29, and 5101.76 of the Revised Code to permit schools and camps to procure and use epinephrine autoinjectors in accordance with prescribed policies, to exempt them from licensing requirements related to the possession of epinephrine autoinjectors, and to declare an emergency.
Title
To permit schools and camps to procure and use epinephrine autoinjectors in accordance with prescribed policies, to exempt them from licensing requirements related to the possession of epinephrine autoinjectors, and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-09 - House - House - SA Concurred in (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - House - House - Emergency clause stood (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration - Emergency Clause (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-20 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-21 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-21 | Governor' Action | |
2014-04-28 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-04-16 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-04-09 | Concurrence | |
2014-04-08 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-04-08 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-11-21 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-11-21 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-11-20 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-11-14 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-10-10 | To Education | |
2013-10-10 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 7110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | 7111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | 713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 13 | 718 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 14 | 143 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 26 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
33 | 28 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
47 | 29 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
47 | 29 | 51 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
47 | 29 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
51 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
51 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 01 | 76 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
51 | 04 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text |