OH HB264 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-19)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 35-19)
Status: Passed on September 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To amend sections 3313.713, 3314.03, 3326.11, and 3328.24 and to enact section 3313.7110 of the Revised Code and to amend the version of section 3326.11 of the Revised Code that is scheduled to take effect on July 1, 2014, regarding care for students with diabetes in schools.
Title
That is scheduled to take effect on July 1, 2014, regarding care for students with diabetes in schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-26 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | Effective Date | |
2014-06-12 | Governor' Action | |
2014-06-21 | End of 10-day period | |
2014-06-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2014-06-03 | Concurrence | |
2014-06-03 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2014-05-28 | Committee Report | |
2014-02-27 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2014-02-27 | Introduced to Senate | |
2014-02-26 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2014-02-12 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-09-12 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-09-12 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | Amended Code | Citation Text | ||
33 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 13 | 7110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
33 | 13 | 713 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 14 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 14 | 03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 26 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 26 | 11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
33 | 28 | Amended Code | Citation Text | |
33 | 28 | 24 | Amended Code | Citation Text |