OH HB147 | 2013-2014 | 130th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-37)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 59-37)
Status: Passed on March 20 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-20 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
To enact section 4731.73 of the Revised Code to require a surgeon performing a mastectomy in a hospital to guide the patient and provide referrals in a manner consistent with the standards of the National Accreditation Program for Breast Centers and to name this act the "Lizzie B. Byrd Act."
Title
To require a surgeon performing a mastectomy in a hospital to guide the patient and provide referrals in a manner consistent with the standards of the National Accreditation Program for Breast Centers and to name this act the "Lizzie B. Byrd Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Consideration (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-05 - House - House - Bill Passed (Vote) (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | Effective Date | |
2013-12-19 | Governor' Action | |
2013-12-24 | End of 10-day period | |
2013-12-12 | Sent to Governor | |
2013-12-04 | Concurrence | |
2013-12-04 | Passed 3rd Consideration Senate | |
2013-12-04 | Committee Report | |
2013-06-06 | To Medicaid, Health & Human Services | |
2013-06-06 | Introduced to Senate | |
2013-06-05 | Passed 3rd Consideration House | |
2013-05-29 | Committee Report - S | |
2013-04-30 | To Health and Aging | |
2013-04-30 | Introduced to House |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
47 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
47 | 31 | 73 | New Code | See Bill Text |