NY S09348 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10173A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - SUBSTITUTED BY A10173A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that for the purposes of the electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program, the term "municipality" shall mean a county or a city or town with a population of one hundred thousand or more.
Title
Provides that for the purposes of the electronic open auction public bond sale pilot program, the term "municipality" shall mean a county or a city or town with a population of one hundred thousand or more.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Local Government Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A10173A |
2024-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1787 |
2024-06-05 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-05-30 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9348A |
2024-05-30 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-05-20 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-05-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10173 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY