NY S09298 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-22 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the real property tax exemption for un-remarried spouses of volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers killed in the line of duty to permit continuation of such exemption for volunteer members with service between two and five years.
Title
Amends the real property tax exemption for un-remarried spouses of volunteer firefighters or volunteer ambulance workers killed in the line of duty to permit continuation of such exemption for volunteer members with service between two and five years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-21 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1234 |
2024-05-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A10235 (Same As) 2024-05-15 - referred to real property taxation