NY S07515 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "climate change property tax assessment relief act"; provides assessment relief to property owners within eligible municipalities; relates to payments of real property tax refunds and credits as a result of participating in the climate change property tax assessment relief act.
Title
Enacts the "climate change property tax assessment relief act"; provides assessment relief to property owners within eligible municipalities; relates to payments of real property tax refunds and credits as a result of participating in the climate change property tax assessment relief act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2024-02-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-01-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-09 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.88 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-06-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-05 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1606 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A07748 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - referred to real property taxation