NY S07384 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9798
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Title
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Brad Hoylman-Sigal [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] |
Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] | Sen. Kevin Parker [D] | Sen. John Sampson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9798 |
2014-06-02 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-29 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.983 |
2014-05-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO CORPORATIONS, AUTHORITIES AND COMMISSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09798 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - tabled