NY A09798 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Title
Relates to extending the amount of time between notice of a project and a public hearing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 112 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | tabled |
2014-11-21 | Senate | vetoed memo.507 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.983 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7384 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.223 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.223 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-05-22 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S07384 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9798