NY S07365 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-28 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires reasonable controls and procedures to be taken with respect to the sale, manufacturing, importing and marketing of pistol converters.
Title
Requires reasonable controls and procedures to be taken with respect to the sale, manufacturing, importing and marketing of pistol converters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-28 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-23 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-22 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1448 |
2024-05-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 7365A |
2024-05-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2023-05-22 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A10053 (Same As) 2024-05-02 - referred to codes