NY S07046 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.313
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Caton fire district.
Title
Relates to the Caton fire district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-11 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.313 |
2014-08-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.404 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted for a9359 |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2014-06-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-10 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-03 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1123 |
2014-06-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-04-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09359 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7046