NY A09359 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - substituted by s7046
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the Caton fire district.
Title
Relates to the Caton fire district.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s7046 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.404 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.404 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07046 (Same As) 2014-08-11 - SIGNED CHAP.313