NY S06695 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-15 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-15 - SIGNED CHAP.401
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the designation of yogurt as the state snack.
Title
Relates to the designation of yogurt as the state snack.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Ranzenhofer [R] | Sen. Patrick Gallivan [R] | Sen. Kathleen Marchione [R] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. James Seward [R] | Sen. David Valesky [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-15 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.401 |
2014-10-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.183 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a8994 |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2014-05-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-05 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-04-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-04-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.433 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A08994 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s6695