NY S06495 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.151
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits the county of Suffolk to extend the tax deadline for certain residents of the town of East Hampton and waive any interest and penalties due or imposed on or before January 31, 2014.
Title
Permits the county of Suffolk to extend the tax deadline for certain residents of the town of East Hampton and waive any interest and penalties due or imposed on or before January 31, 2014.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.151 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.572 |
2014-04-29 | Assembly | substituted for a8635 |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-03-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-02-11 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-02-10 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-02-04 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.128 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A08635 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - substituted by s6495