NY S05855 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.142
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - SIGNED CHAP.142
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes hunting of big game with rifles in the county of Livingston.
Title
Authorizes hunting of big game with rifles in the county of Livingston.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.142 |
2014-07-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.293 |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | substituted for a9201a |
2014-06-02 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2014-06-02 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-02 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-21 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING (T) 5855B |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.622 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5855A |
2014-01-29 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A08157 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - referred to environmental conservation
A09201 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s5855b
A09201 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - substituted by s5855b