NY S05791 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4054A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4054A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain information about special education upon entry to school.
Title
Relates to certain information about special education upon entry to school.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A4054A |
2014-06-18 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1557 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-01-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 5791A |
2014-01-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2013-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A04054 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - signed chap.434