NY A04054 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.434
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - signed chap.434
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to certain information about special education upon entry to school.
Title
Relates to certain information about special education upon entry to school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Senate | signed chap.434 |
2014-11-10 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1557 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5791A |
2014-06-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.61 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | rules report cal.61 |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | print number 4054a |
2014-01-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-01-30 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05791 (Same As) 2014-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4054A