NY S04652 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-09 - referred to consumer affairs and protection
Pending: Assembly Consumer Affairs and Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates the sale of methamphetamine precursor drugs.
Title
Regulates the sale of methamphetamine precursor drugs.
Sponsors
Sen. David Valesky [D] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Joseph Griffo [R] | Sen. Thomas Libous [R] |
Sen. Thomas O'Mara [R] | Sen. Catharine Young [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2014-06-09 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-28 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 4652B |
2014-05-14 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.603 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4652A |
2014-02-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-13 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2013-06-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1349 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
Same As/Similar To
A01359 (Same As) 2014-05-21 - print number 1359c