NY S02360 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5299B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5299B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the mental health care and treatment of injured employees by licensed clinical social workers under the workers' compensation program.
Title
Authorizes the mental health care and treatment of injured employees by licensed clinical social workers under the workers' compensation program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A5299B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1596 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-17 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2360B |
2014-06-17 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2014-04-28 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
2013-06-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2360A |
2013-06-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2013-05-21 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO LABOR |
Same As/Similar To
A05299 (Same As) 2014-12-17 - tabled