NY A05299 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the mental health care and treatment of injured employees by licensed clinical social workers under the workers' compensation program.
Title
Authorizes the mental health care and treatment of injured employees by licensed clinical social workers under the workers' compensation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | tabled |
2014-12-17 | Senate | vetoed memo.533 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1596 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2360B |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.439 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.439 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 5299b |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to labor |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | print number 5299a |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02360 (Same As) 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5299B