NY S01998 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-12 - APPROVAL MEMO.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on December 12 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-12 - APPROVAL MEMO.20
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that practicing or appearing as an attorney-at-law without being admitted and registered shall be a class E felony instead of a misdemeanor.
Title
Provides that practicing or appearing as an attorney-at-law without being admitted and registered shall be a class E felony instead of a misdemeanor.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Fuschillo [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. John DeFrancisco [R] | Sen. Ruth Hassell-Thompson [D] |
Sen. William Larkin [R] | Sen. Stephen Saland [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-12 | Assembly | APPROVAL MEMO.20 |
2012-12-12 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.492 |
2012-12-05 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.441 |
2012-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a5700a |
2012-05-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2012-05-01 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-05-01 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-03-30 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 1998A |
2012-01-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2012-01-19 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2012-01-18 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.38 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2011-03-07 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2011-03-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-03-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-03-03 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2011-03-02 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2011-03-01 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.123 |
2011-01-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A05700 (Same As) 2012-06-20 - substituted by s1998a