NY S01015 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1015E
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-04-23 - PRINT NUMBER 1015E
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to permitting requirements for children's camps including permit requirements, inspection requirements and violations.
Title
Relates to permitting requirements for children's camps including permit requirements, inspection requirements and violations.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Libous [R] | Sen. Tony Avella [D] | Sen. Philip Boyle [R] | Sen. David Carlucci [D] |
Sen. George Latimer [D] | Sen. Jack Martins [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1015E |
2014-04-23 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2013-06-19 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1015D |
2013-06-19 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-05-07 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1015C |
2013-05-07 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-04-23 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1015B |
2013-04-23 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-03-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1015A |
2013-03-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO HEALTH |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A02193 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means