NY S00440 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates, as peace officers, special deputy sheriffs of the county of Chautauqua within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Title
Designates, as peace officers, special deputy sheriffs of the county of Chautauqua within the grounds of and properties owned by the Chautauqua Institution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-15 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Senate Codes Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2018-06-04 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-06-04 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-05-22 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2018-05-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2018-05-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1268 |
2018-01-22 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 440A |
2018-01-22 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-15 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-14 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1588 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2017-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO CODES |
Same As/Similar To
A08580 (Same As) 2018-02-15 - print number 8580a