NY S00317 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits mortgagee from refusing to accept partial mortgage payments.
Title
Prohibits mortgagee from refusing to accept partial mortgage payments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2013-01-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
A02069 (Same As) 2014-01-15 - enacting clause stricken
A09276 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - referred to judiciary
A09276 (Same As) 2014-04-07 - referred to judiciary