NY A10006 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7027
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the town of Alden to convey an easement to the village of Alden in the Alden Town Park.
Title
Authorizes the town of Alden to convey an easement to the village of Alden in the Alden Town Park.
Sponsors
Asm. Jane Corwin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s7027 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.392 |
2012-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07027 (Same As) 2012-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.84