NY S07027 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Status: Passed on June 29 2012 - 100% progress
Action: 2012-06-29 - SIGNED CHAP.84
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the town of Alden to convey an easement to the village of Alden in the Alden Town Park.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the town of Alden to convey an easement to the village of Alden in the Alden Town Park.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-06-12 - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-06-29AssemblySIGNED CHAP.84
2012-06-22SenateDELIVERED TO GOVERNOR
2012-06-19Assemblyreturned to senate
2012-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2012-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-19Assemblyhome rule request
2012-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.392
2012-06-19Assemblysubstituted for a10006
2012-06-12Assemblyreferred to ways and means
2012-06-12SenateDELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY
2012-06-12SenatePASSED SENATE
2012-06-12SenateHOME RULE REQUEST
2012-06-11SenateADVANCED TO THIRD READING
2012-06-06Senate2ND REPORT CAL.
2012-06-05Senate1ST REPORT CAL.1020
2012-04-24SenateREFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION

Same As/Similar To

A10006 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - substituted by s7027

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback