NY A09733 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - signed chap.126
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical changes to the protection of people with special needs act.
Title
Makes technical changes to the protection of people with special needs act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | Senate | signed chap.126 |
2014-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1589 |
2014-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7885 |
2014-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.567 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.567 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | print number 9733a |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-05-20 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07118 (Same As) 2014-06-17 - referred to mental health
S07885 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9733A
S07885 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9733A