NY A09344 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the commissioner of parks, recreation and historic preservation to permit composting facilities at state parks when such facility does not harm the natural environment or integrity of the park, and provided that such facilities shall comply with relevant codes, rules and regulations relating to composting facilities.
Title
Authorizes the commissioner of parks, recreation and historic preservation to permit composting facilities at state parks when such facility does not harm the natural environment or integrity of the park, and provided that such facilities shall comply with relevant codes, rules and regulations relating to composting facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Arts And Sports Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | print number 9344a |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | referred to tourism, parks, arts and sports development |
Same As/Similar To
S07935 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO CULTURAL AFFAIRS, TOURISM, PARKS AND RECREATION