NY A09263 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - referred to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property from December 1, 2024 to December 1, 2027.
Title
Extends the authorization of the county of Wyoming to impose a county recording tax on obligations secured by a mortgage on real property from December 1, 2024 to December 1, 2027.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S08343 (Same As) 2024-01-19 - REFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS