NY A08984 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly

Status

Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progress
Action: 2014-05-30 - advanced to third reading cal.840
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a smart phone device "kill switch"; requires the ability to remotely delete data on a smart phone device in the event such device is lost or stolen; provides that such technology is required by July 1, 2015.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a smart phone device "kill switch"; requires the ability to remotely delete data on a smart phone device in the event such device is lost or stolen; provides that such technology is required by July 1, 2015.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.840
2014-05-28Assemblyreported
2014-05-13Assemblyprint number 8984a
2014-05-13Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2014-03-06Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S06850 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - PRINT NUMBER 6850C

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback