NY A07756 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - approval memo.15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to required attendance at schools.
Title
Relates to required attendance at schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | approval memo.15 |
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.491 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-05-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.264 |
2014-05-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6688 |
2014-02-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-02-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.381 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.382 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.382 |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05862 (Same As) 2014-02-27 - RECOMMIT, ENACTING CLAUSE STRICKEN
S06688 (Same As) 2014-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7756
S06688 (Same As) 2014-05-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7756