NY A07713 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-17 - held for consideration in ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes certain counties and cities to impose up to a four percent rate of sales and compensating use taxes; preserves the authority of certain municipalities to impose such taxes at rates in excess of four percent.
Title
Authorizes certain counties and cities to impose up to a four percent rate of sales and compensating use taxes; preserves the authority of certain municipalities to impose such taxes at rates in excess of four percent.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in ways and means |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | print number 7713b |
2014-06-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | print number 7713a |
2014-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S03812 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES