NY A06176 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - print number 6176a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 3 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-15 - print number 6176a
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the assessment of residential real property transferred from a charitable nonprofit housing organization to low-income persons.
Title
Relates to the assessment of residential real property transferred from a charitable nonprofit housing organization to low-income persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-15 | Assembly | print number 6176a |
2024-03-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06255 (Same As) 2024-03-28 - PRINT NUMBER 6255A