NY A06059 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - print number 6059a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - print number 6059a
Pending: Assembly Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits health insurers, health care plans and HMOs from requiring prior authorization for pre-exposure prophylaxis used to prevent HIV infection.
Title
Prohibits health insurers, health care plans and HMOs from requiring prior authorization for pre-exposure prophylaxis used to prevent HIV infection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Assembly | print number 6059a |
2024-03-12 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-03-31 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S03227 (Same As) 2024-03-14 - ADVANCED TO THIRD READING