NY A04422 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - substituted by s3149a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - substituted by s3149a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote; creates a compact between the states and the District of Columbia; defines terms.
Title
Enacts the agreement among the states to elect the president by national popular vote; creates a compact between the states and the District of Columbia; defines terms.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 100 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Assembly | substituted by s3149a |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | amended on third reading 4422a |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.202 |
2014-01-08 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-01-08 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO ELECTIONS |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.215 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | rules report cal.215 |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-02-05 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S03149 (Same As) 2014-04-15 - SIGNED CHAP.19