NY A04088 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - print number 4088b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - print number 4088b
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to licensing consumer debt collectors; sets minimum standards and regulations; establishes penalties for violations.
Title
Relates to licensing consumer debt collectors; sets minimum standards and regulations; establishes penalties for violations.
Sponsors
Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Christopher Burdick [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] |
Asm. Alfred Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Banks Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | print number 4088b |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2024-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to banks |
2023-09-22 | Assembly | print number 4088a |
2023-09-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to banks |
2023-02-09 | Assembly | referred to banks |
Same As/Similar To
S00666 (Same As) 2024-04-09 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE