NY A03369 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - ordered to third reading rules cal.436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - ordered to third reading rules cal.436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the sale of monuments.
Title
Relates to the sale of monuments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.436 |
2014-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.436 |
2014-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-25 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S04178 (Same As) 2014-06-20 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES