NY A03073 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires persons the ages of 16 or 17 to wear a helmet when riding a class one or class two bicycle with electric assist.
Title
Requires persons the ages of 16 or 17 to wear a helmet when riding a class one or class two bicycle with electric assist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-04-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.402 |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | reported |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | print number 3073b |
2024-03-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2024-03-26 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | print number 3073a |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S09037 (Same As) 2024-04-11 - REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION