NY A02725 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - committed to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - committed to real property taxation
Pending: Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Congregation Beis Medrash of Lawrence to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Title
Authorizes the Congregation Beis Medrash of Lawrence to receive retroactive real property tax exempt status.
Sponsors
Asm. Eric Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Assembly | committed to real property taxation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.77 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.492 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.492 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-27 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S06699 (Same As) 2024-01-03 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT