NY A01046 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - advanced to third reading cal.636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-08 - advanced to third reading cal.636
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the uniform treatment of waste from the exploration, development, extraction, or production of crude oil or natural gas.
Title
Relates to the uniform treatment of waste from the exploration, development, extraction, or production of crude oil or natural gas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.636 |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | reported |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2013-05-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.373 |
2013-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S00674 (Same As) 2014-01-08 - REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION