NY A00486 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s2838b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-11 - substituted by s2838b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a study and report on methods to modernize information collection, retention and dissemination in the state.
Title
Requires a study and report on methods to modernize information collection, retention and dissemination in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s2838b |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.112 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2014-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | print number 486b |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2014-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | print number 486a |
2014-01-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental operations |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-01-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02838 (Same As) 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.514