NY S02838 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.514
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 21 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-11-21 - VETOED MEMO.514
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a study and report on methods to modernize information collection, retention and dissemination in the state.
Title
Requires a study and report on methods to modernize information collection, retention and dissemination in the state.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-11-21 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.514 |
2014-11-10 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.112 |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | substituted for a486b |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2014-06-11 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-10 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1234 |
2014-06-10 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2014-06-05 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2838B |
2014-06-05 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2014-01-27 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 2838A |
2014-01-27 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-06-12 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2013-06-12 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-06-12 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-06-12 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1299 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2013-02-01 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO INFRASTRUCTURE AND CAPITAL INVESTMENT |
2013-01-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A00486 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - substituted by s2838b