NV SJR14 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - File No. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-24 - File No. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to enact the Lyon County Economic Development and Conservation Act. (BDR R-1114)
Title
Urges Congress to enact the Lyon County Economic Development and Conservation Act. (BDR R-1114)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-24 | Senate | File No. 38. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | To enrollment. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 39, Nays: None, Excused: 3.) To Senate. |
2013-05-18 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-05-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee. |
2013-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-03-26 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer. |